Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Noel Portal Pedregosa

Bishop-Elect of Malaybalay, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1964 Born
11 Sep 199126.8Ordained PriestPriest of Malaybalay, Philippines
7 Jul 202055.7AppointedAdministrator of Malaybalay, Philippines
29 Jun 202156.6AppointedBishop of Malaybalay, Philippines
14 Sep 202156.9Ordained BishopBishop of Malaybalay, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Noel Portal Pedregosa
Father Noel Portal Pedregosa (born ) Bishop-Elect of Malaybalay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBialong, M’lang, North Cotabato, Diocese of Malaybalay
Ordained BishopSan Isidro Labrador, Cathedral, Malaybalay, Diocese of Malaybalay

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Malaybalay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2021
  • mn: CB, 29 Jun 2021
  • ob: CB, 8 Jul 2021
  • c2+: CB, 14 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Jul 2021

Quantcast