Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Massimiliano Palinuro

Vicar Apostolic of Istanbul, Turkey

Apostolic Administrator of Istanbul (Constantinople) (Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1974 Born
1998²23.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia, Italy
24 Apr 199924.8Ordained PriestPriest of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia, Italy
14 Sep 202147.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Istanbul, Turkey
14 Sep 202147.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Istanbul (Constantinople) (Greek), Turkey
7 Dec 202147.4Ordained BishopVicar Apostolic of Istanbul, Turkey
18 Dec 202147.5InstalledVicar Apostolic of Istanbul, Turkey

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Massimiliano Palinuro
Father Massimiliano Palinuro (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Istanbul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAriano Irpino, Diocese of Ariano, Italy
Ordained PriestCathedral Basilica, Ariano Irpino, Diocese of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Ariano Irpino, Diocese of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia, Italy

Please contact the Father through the Vicariate Apostolic of Istanbul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Sep 2021
  • c01/ob: CB, 14 Sep 2021
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Sep 2021

Quantcast