Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Pascarella

Bishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

Bishop of Ischia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1948 Born
14 Sep 197426.4Ordained PriestPriest of Acerra, Italy
14 Nov 199850.6AppointedBishop of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia, Italy
9 Jan 199950.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia, Italy
10 Jan 200455.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
2 Sep 200557.4SucceededBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
22 May 202173.1AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
19 Jun 202173.2InstalledBishop of Ischia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Pascarella
Bishop Gennaro Pascarella (born ) Bishop of Pozzuoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCervino
Ordained BishopMaria SS. Asunta, Cathedral, Acerra, Diocese of Acerra

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pozzuoli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s: Bollettino, 2 Sep 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,465
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 May 2021
  • i: CB, 22 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 May 2021

Quantcast