Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Carlo Villano

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Pozzuoli, Italy

Titular Bishop of Sorres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1969 Born
1994²24.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Aversa, Italy
29 Jun 199525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Aversa, Italy
3 Jul 202151.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
3 Jul 202151.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sorres
19 Sep 202152.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sorres

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Villano
Father Carlo Villano (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Pozzuoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAversa, Diocese of Aversa
Ordained PriestSan Paolo, Cathedral, Aversa, Diocese of Aversa
Ordained BishopPiazza Antonio De Curtis, Monterusciello, Diocese of Pozzuoli

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Pozzuoli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2021
  • od/c01: AM, 6 Jul 2021
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Aug 2021

Quantcast