Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Marek Ochlak, O.M.I.

Bishop-Elect of Fenoarivo Atsinanana, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1966 Born
7 Sep 198519.4EnteredMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
8 Sep 198620.4First VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
8 Sep 199024.4Perpetual VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
15 Jun 199125.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
20 Jun 199226.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
17 Apr 202559.0AppointedBishop of Fenoarivo Atsinanana, Madagascar
6 Jul 202559.3Ordained BishopBishop of Fenoarivo Atsinanana, Madagascar

MicroData Summary
Marek Ochlak
Father Marek Ochlak O.M.I.
(born )
Bishop-Elect of Fenoarivo Atsinanana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNowe Miasto Lubawskie, Diocese of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
Ordained DeaconOMI Major Seminary, Chapel, Obra, Archdiocese of Poznań, Poland
Ordained PriestOMI Major Seminary, Chapel, Obra, Archdiocese of Poznań, Poland
Ordained BishopRector's Church of St. Joseph, Gdańsk, Archdiocese of Gdańsk, Poland

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Fenoarivo Atsinanana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2025
  • qomi/c01/bpd/loc: CB, 17 Apr 2025
  • ob: CB, 3 May 2025
  • c2+: CB, 5 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 6 May 2025