Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Zolile Peter Mpambani, S.C.I.

Archbishop of Bloemfontein, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1957 Born
28 Jan 198224.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
25 Apr 198730.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
6 May 201356.2AppointedBishop of Kokstad, South Africa
3 Aug 201356.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kokstad, South Africa
1 Apr 202063.1AppointedArchbishop of Bloemfontein, South Africa
19 Jun 202063.3InstalledArchbishop of Bloemfontein, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Zolile Peter Mpambani
Archbishop Zolile Peter Mpambani S.C.I. (born ) Archbishop of Bloemfontein

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUmlami
Ordained BishopGrounds of, Kokstad College, Kokstad, Diocese of Kokstad

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bloemfontein.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 May 2013
  • ob: CB, 26 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,843
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Apr 2020
  • i: CB, 22 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 May 2021

Quantcast