Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raúl Antonio Martinez Paredes

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala

Titular Bishop of Mizigi

Apostolic Administrator of Izabal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1943 Born
17 Oct 198744.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sololá, Guatemala
28 Jan 199955.7AppointedBishop of Sololá-Chimaltenango, Guatemala
20 Mar 199955.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sololá-Chimaltenango, Guatemala
28 Jul 200764.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala
28 Jul 200764.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mizigi
24 Feb 201874.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santiago de Guatemala
3 Sep 202077.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Santiago de Guatemala
21 Sep 202178.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Izabal, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Raúl Antonio Martinez Paredes
Bishop Raúl Antonio Martinez Paredes (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Martín Jilotepeque
Ordained BishopGimnasio deportivo, Sololá, Diocese of Sololá-Chimaltenango

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Santiago de Guatemala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,490
  • ab: CB, 22 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Sep 2021

Quantcast