Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Edward Koenig

Bishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1956 Born
14 May 198326.7Ordained PriestPriest of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
30 Apr 202164.7AppointedBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
13 Jul 202164.9Ordained BishopBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA

MicroData Summary for William Edward Koenig
Bishop William Edward Koenig (born ) Bishop of Wilmington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQueens, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Ordained PriestSt. Agnes, Cathedral, Rockville Centre, Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York
Ordained BishopSaint Elizabeth, Church, Wilmington, Diocese of Wilmington, Delaware

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wilmington.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2021
  • mn/ob/c1+: CB, 30 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Jul 2021

Quantcast