Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Andrew Hero

Bishop of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1969 Born
7 Oct 199929.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
29 Jun 200030.5Ordained PriestPriest of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
25 Mar 202151.2AppointedBishop of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada
11 Jun 202151.4Ordained BishopBishop of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for Stephen Andrew Hero
Bishop Stephen Andrew Hero (born ) Bishop of Prince-Albert

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLachine, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec
Ordained DeaconRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Prince-Albert, Diocese of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Prince-Albert.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2021
  • od/c01: CB, 25 Mar 2021
  • ob: CB, 1 Apr 2021
  • c2+: CB, 21 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Jun 2021

Quantcast