Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Gray

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Hypsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1817Born
10 Apr 184123.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain
1 May 184123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain
6 May 186244.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain
6 May 186244.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hypsus
19 Oct 186245.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hypsus
15 Dec 186548.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain
16 Apr 186951.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain
14 Jan 187254.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Gray
Bishop John Gray (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Western District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuckie, Banffshire
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Andrew, Glasgow, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, Scotland
Death PlaceRothesay
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter's, Cemetery, Dalbeth, Glasgow

  • a priest for 30.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 312
  • od/c01: CB, 17 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 33
  • b: The Catholic Hierarchy of Scotland, Page 21, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Mar 2021

Quantcast