Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Robert Golka

Bishop of Colorado Springs, Colorado, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1966 Born
3 Jun 199427.6Ordained PriestPriest of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA
30 Apr 202154.6AppointedBishop of Colorado Springs, Colorado, USA
29 Jun 202154.7Ordained BishopBishop of Colorado Springs, Colorado, USA

MicroData Summary for James Robert Golka
Bishop James Robert Golka (born ) Bishop of Colorado Springs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrand Island, Diocese of Grand Island, Nebraska
Ordained BishopHoly Apostles, Church, Colorado Springs, Diocese of Colorado Springs, Colorado

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Colorado Springs.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2021
  • ob/c1: CB, 30 Apr 2021
  • c2+: CB, 15 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Jun 2021

Quantcast