Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Marie Anne Alain Gobilliard

Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France

Titular Bishop of Carpentras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1968 Born
30 Jun 199628.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
29 Jun 199729.3Ordained PriestPriest of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
16 Jun 201648.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France
16 Jun 201648.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Carpentras
11 Sep 201648.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carpentras

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Marie Anne Alain Gobilliard (VIAF: 160319335)
Bishop Emmanuel Marie Anne Alain Gobilliard (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaumur
Ordained DeaconSaint-Laurent, Church, Le Puy, Diocese of Le Puy-en-Velay
Ordained PriestSaint-Laurent, Church, Le Puy, Diocese of Le Puy-en-Velay
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de Fourvière, Basilica, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Lyon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 Jun 2016
  • fn/c34: CB, 19 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,101
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast