Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alberto Giraldo Jaramillo, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Medellín, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1934Born
9 Nov 195824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Manizales, Colombia
196025.2ProfessedPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
8 Aug 197439.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Popayán, Colombia
8 Aug 197439.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Obba
15 Sep 197439.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obba
26 Apr 197742.5AppointedBishop of Chiquinquirá, Colombia
26 Jul 198348.8AppointedBishop of Cúcuta, Colombia
18 Dec 199056.1AppointedArchbishop of Popayán, Colombia
13 Feb 199762.3AppointedArchbishop of Medellín, Colombia
16 Feb 201075.3RetiredArchbishop of Medellín, Colombia
21 Jul 202186.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Medellín, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Alberto Giraldo Jaramillo
Archbishop Alberto Giraldo Jaramillo P.S.S. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Medellín

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManizales
Ordained BishopGrand Seminary, Bogotá, Archdiocese of Bogotá
Death PlaceSan Jorge, Hospital, Pereira, Diocese of Pereira

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 46.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 27, Number 1,519
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 21 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Jul 2021

Quantcast