Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geraldo Dantas de Andrade, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Cibaliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1931Born
2 Feb 195624.3Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
18 Dec 195726.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
18 Feb 199866.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
18 Feb 199866.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cibaliana
18 Apr 199866.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cibaliana
15 Sep 201078.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
1 May 202189.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Geraldo Dantas de Andrade
Bishop Geraldo Dantas de Andrade S.C.I. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of São Luís do Maranhão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
Ordained BishopGinásio, Irmãos Maristas, São Luis, Maranhão, Archdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão
Death PlaceSeminário da Congregação dos Padres Dehonianos, Cantinho do Céu, São Luis, Estado de Maranhão

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Sep 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,265
  • d: CB, 1 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 May 2021

Quantcast