Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leomar Antônio Brustolin

Archbishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1967 Born
20 Dec 199225.3Ordained PriestPriest of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
7 Jan 201547.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
7 Jan 201547.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigava
25 Mar 201547.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigava
2 Jun 202153.7AppointedArchbishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
15 Aug 202154.0InstalledArchbishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Leomar Antônio Brustolin
Archbishop Leomar Antônio Brustolin (born ) Archbishop of Santa Maria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaxias do Sul, Diocese of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul
Ordained BishopSanta Teresa, Cathedral, Caxias do Sul, Diocese of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Santa Maria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2015
  • ob: CB, 7 Jan 2015
  • c2+: CB, 31 Jan 2015
  • c5: CB, 25 Mar 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,396
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Jun 2021

Quantcast