Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Itacir Brassiani, M.S.F.

Bishop-Elect of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1959 Born
29 Jan 198424.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
Nov 1986³26.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
21 Feb 198727.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
19 Jun 202464.4AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
29 Sep 202464.7Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Itacir Brassiani
(WikiData: Q126728013)
Father Itacir Brassiani M.S.F. (born ) Bishop-Elect of Santa Cruz do Sul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoledade, Diocese of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul
Ordained PriestSanta Lúcia, Church, Anchieta, Diocese of Chapecó, Santa Catarina
Ordained BishopSão João Batista, Cathedral, Santa Cruz do Sul, Diocese of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Santa Cruz do Sul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2024
  • od/c1: AK, 19 Jun 2024
  • ob: CB, 26 Jun 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 27 Jun 2024