Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph Louis Cardinal Bernardin

Deceased

Archbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

Cardinal-Priest of Gesù Divin Lavoratore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1928Born
26 Apr 195224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
9 Mar 196637.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
9 Mar 196637.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lugura
26 Apr 196638.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lugura
5 Apr 196840.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
21 Nov 197244.6AppointedArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
19 Dec 197244.7InstalledArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
8 Jul 198254.2AppointedArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
25 Aug 198254.3InstalledArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
2 Feb 198354.8Elevated to Cardinal
2 Feb 198354.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Gesù Divin Lavoratore
14 Nov 199668.6DiedArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Louis Bernardin (VIAF: 64180158)
Joseph Louis Cardinal Bernardin (born , died ) Archbishop of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColumbia, Diocese of Charleston, South Carolina
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph, Church, Columbia, Diocese of Charleston, South Carolina
Ordained BishopSt. John the Baptist, Cathedral, Charleston, Diocese of Charleston, South Carolina
Death PlaceChicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Buried Place (Original)Bishops' Chapel, Mount Carmel, Cemetery, Hillside, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
  • a cardinal for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Jul 2021

Quantcast