Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Zaccharian

Deceased

Bishop of Artuin degli Armeni (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1828Born
1 Oct 187849.9AppointedBishop of Artuin degli Armeni (Armenian), Turkey
28 Dec 187850.1Ordained BishopBishop of Artuin degli Armeni (Armenian), Turkey
1888¹59.2DiedBishop of Artuin degli Armeni (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Zaccharian
Bishop Giovanni Battista Zaccharian (born , died 1888) Bishop of Artuin degli Armeni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArtuin, Diocese of Artuin degli Armeni (Armenian)
Ordained BishopArtuin, Diocese of Artuin degli Armeni (Armenian)

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 124
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1878, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017