Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Melchisedechian

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)

Titular Bishop of Tingis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1830Born
18 May 186636.0AppointedBishop of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)
29 Jul 186636.2Ordained BishopBishop of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)
12 Nov 188959.5ResignedBishop of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)
31 May 189262.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tingis
1894¹63.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano Melchisedechian
Bishop Stefano Melchisedechian (born , died 1894) Bishop Emeritus of Erzerum (Garin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSarciabed
Ordained BishopConstantinople, Archeparchy of Constantinople (Istanbul) (Armenian)

  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 263, and Page 554
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1866, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017