Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacobus Wemmers, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Memphis

Titular See: (Vicar/Ethiopia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1598Born
25 Sep 161617.9ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
24 Apr 164546.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ethiopia
24 Apr 164546.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Memphis
5 Jun 164546.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Memphis
12 Sep 164546.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Jacobus Wemmers
Bishop Jacobus Wemmers O. Carm. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Ethiopia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnvers

  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 239
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Nov 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast