Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Domín Funes, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gaeta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1576Born
28 Oct 159317.8ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
30 Dec 163660.9SelectedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
14 Dec 163761.9ConfirmedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
21 Dec 163761.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gaeta, Italy
23 Apr 165074.2DiedBishop of Gaeta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Domín Funes
Bishop Jerónimo Domín Funes O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Gaeta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalatayud, Diocese of Tarazona, Spain
Ordained BishopSte Marie in Transpontine, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 127
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 164, Number 1,033
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1637, Number 37
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 49, Number 3,346

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast