Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Weimann, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1892Born
3 Feb 191219.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
10 Aug 191725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
1 Aug 194048.3AppointedBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
8 Sep 194048.4Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
30 Mar 196168.9DiedBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Weimann
Bishop José Weimann C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago del Estero

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHinojo

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 50
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast