Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philipp Franz Wilderich Nepomuk von Walderdorf

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1739Born
6 Feb 177333.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trier, Germany
17 May 177738.2Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
22 Apr 179758.1SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
18 Dec 179758.7ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
19 Jan 180060.8Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
21 Apr 181071.1DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Philipp Franz Wilderich Nepomuk von Walderdorf
Bishop Philipp Franz Wilderich Nepomuk von Walderdorf (born , died ) Bishop of Speyer

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMainz

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1800, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 385

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018