Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Konrad von Schroffenberg, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Freising

Bishop of Regensburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1743BornKonstanz
28 Oct 177027.7ProfessedMember of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
2 Dec 177027.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
6 Dec 177027.8Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
1 Mar 179047.0SelectedBishop of Freising, Germany
30 Mar 179047.1SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
21 Jun 179047.3ConfirmedBishop of Freising, Germany
21 Jun 179047.3ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
22 Aug 179047.5Ordained BishopBishop of Freising, Germany
4 Apr 180360.1DiedBishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Konrad von Schroffenberg
Bishop Joseph Konrad von Schroffenberg C.R.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Freising

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 219, and Page 352

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Mar 2016