Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Nepomuk von Wolf

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1743BornOettingen
12 May 176522.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Regensburg, Germany
15 Mar 176622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
15 Dec 178845.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany
15 Dec 178845.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
11 Jan 178945.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
30 Dec 180259.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
7 May 181774.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Regensburg, Germany
5 Feb 181874.8SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
6 Apr 181875.0ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
1 Jan 182278.7InstalledBishop of Regensburg, Germany
23 Aug 182986.4DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Nepomuk von Wolf
Bishop Johann Nepomuk von Wolf (born , died ) Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 318
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,054
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 200, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016