Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Antoine Marie Vuylsteke, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles

Titular Bishop of Charadrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1869Born
15 Aug 189526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
10 Jun 191040.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles
10 Jun 191040.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Charadrus
29 Sep 191041.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Charadrus
4 Aug 193061.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Michel Antoine Marie Vuylsteke
Bishop Michel Antoine Marie Vuylsteke O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Curaçao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDelfshaven, Netherlands

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast