Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augusto Antonio Vicentini

Deceased

Archbishop of L’Aquila, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1829Born
11 Mar 185424.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 187949.4AppointedBishop of Conversano, Italy
22 May 187949.4Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
13 May 188151.4AppointedArchbishop of L’Aquila, Italy
11 Sep 189262.7DiedArchbishop of L’Aquila, Italy

MicroData Summary for Augusto Antonio Vicentini (VIAF: 70860513)
Archbishop Augusto Antonio Vicentini (born , died ) Archbishop of L’Aquila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAquila, Archdiocese of L’Aquila
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 114, and Page 224
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017