Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Tommaso Venetiani

Deceased

Bishop of Troia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1588¹Born
30 Jan 164557.0AppointedBishop of Troia, Italy
19 Feb 164557.1Ordained BishopBishop of Troia, Italy
1647¹59.0DiedBishop of Troia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Tommaso Venetiani
Bishop Giovanni Tommaso Venetiani (born 1588, died 1647) Bishop of Troia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonopoli
Ordained BishopSanta Maria della Vallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 346
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 6
  • c3+: AT, 21 Sep 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast