Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Tornielli

Deceased

Bishop of Novara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1579BornNovara
15 Dec 163657.8AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
25 Jan 163757.9Ordained BishopBishop of Novara, Italy
8 Mar 1650³71.1DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Tornielli
Bishop Antonio Tornielli (born , died ) Bishop of Novara

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 262
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 98, Number 590
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1637, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Sep 2016