Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerolamo Vela

Deceased

Bishop of Larino, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Mar 1591AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
21 Apr 1591Ordained BishopBishop of Larino, Italy
21 Nov 1611DiedBishop of Larino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Vela
Bishop Gerolamo Vela (died ) Bishop of Larino

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSte Marie du peuple, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 219
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 29, Number 139
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018