Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Vaugirault

Deceased

Bishop of Angers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1680BornLongué
1705¹24.1Ordained PriestPriest of Angers, France
12 Oct 173049.9SelectedBishop of Angers, France
18 Dec 173050.1ConfirmedBishop of Angers, France
28 Jan 173150.2Ordained BishopBishop of Angers, France
21 Jun 175877.6DiedBishop of Angers, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Vaugirault:
Bishop Jean de Vaugirault (born , died ) Bishop of Angers

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 7 Oct 2013