Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel de la Torre

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618¹Born
15 Jun 164729.4Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 167759.3AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
30 May 167759.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
3 Dec 167961.9DiedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel de la Torre
Archbishop Manuel de la Torre (born 1618, died ) Archbishop of Brindisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmpudia, Spain

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 128, and Page 235
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 215, Number 1,339
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast