Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingos Torrado, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Goa, India

Titular Bishop of Fisicula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1555¹Born
7 Feb 160550.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Goa, India
7 Feb 160550.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Fisicula
13 Apr 160853.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fisicula
30 Dec 161257.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Goa, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domingos Torrado
Bishop Domingos Torrado O.S.A. (born 1555, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Goa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFontana

  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 188
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,834
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1608, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018