Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio de Tommasi

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Feb 1776BornCapua
22 Dec 179822.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 183256.0SelectedBishop of San Severo, Italy
2 Jul 183256.3ConfirmedBishop of San Severo, Italy
8 Jul 183256.3Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
6 Jan 184366.8DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio de Tommasi
Bishop Giulio de Tommasi (born , died ) Bishop of San Severo

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 344
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Jul 2016