Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bruno Maria Tedeschi

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1779Born
9 Apr 180324.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Nov 183455.6SelectedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
6 Apr 183556.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
20 Apr 183556.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
30 Apr 183556.0InstalledArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
19 Jan 184363.7DiedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bruno Maria Tedeschi (VIAF: 304917473)
Archbishop Bruno Maria Tedeschi (born , died ) Archbishop of Rossano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSerra San Bruno

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 326
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1835, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast