Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Tapia, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1582³BornVillorios
7 Jan 164158.8AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
25 Jul 164159.4Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
24 Apr 164563.1AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
23 Aug 164967.5AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
23 Sep 165270.6AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
25 Aug 165775.5DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Tapia:
Archbishop Pedro Tapia O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,163
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,854
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 164

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013