Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Stracchini

Deceased

Bishop of Segni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1770Born
30 Mar 179322.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 May 179322.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Aug 181949.0AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
12 Sep 181949.1Ordained BishopBishop of Segni, Italy
19 Jul 182353.0DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Stracchini
Bishop Francesco Stracchini (born , died ) Bishop of Segni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 30.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 346
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018