Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Niels Stensen

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions

Titular Bishop of Titopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1638BornKobenhavn
7 Nov 166729.8Converted
13 Apr 167537.2Ordained PriestPriest of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
21 Aug 167739.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions, Germany
13 Sep 167739.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Titopolis
19 Sep 167739.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Titopolis
1680²41.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
168344.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
5 Dec 168648.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions, Germany
23 Oct 1988Beatified

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Niels Stensen:
Bishop Bl. Niels Stensen (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Nordic Missions

  • a priest for 11.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 382
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015