Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcello Stella

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jun 1636Ordained PriestPriest
26 Mar 1640AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
9 Apr 1640Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia, Italy
1642²DiedBishop of Isernia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcello Stella
Bishop Marcello Stella (died 1642) Bishop of Isernia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 5.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 211
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 105, Number 635
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018