Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Youssef Antoine Soueif

Archbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus

Note/Previous Titular See: (Greece)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1962 Born
3 Sep 198725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)
29 Oct 200846.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
6 Dec 200846.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
11 Oct 201856.2AppointedApostolic Visitor (Visitator)

MicroData Summary for Youssef Antoine Soueif
Archbishop Youssef Antoine Soueif (born ) Archbishop of Cipro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChekka
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame du Liban, Basilica, Harissa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cipro (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,993
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 20 Nov 2018

Quantcast