Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antioco Serra Urru (Sisra)

Deceased

Bishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1729³BornGenoni
17 May 178051.3SelectedBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
18 Sep 178051.6ConfirmedBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
14 Jan 178152.0Ordained BishopBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
8 Feb 178657.0DiedBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antioco Serra Urru (Sisra):
Bishop Giovanni Antioco Serra Urru (Sisra) (born , died ) Bishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori)

  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 223
  • b/c2: CB, 13 Dec 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015