Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Scotti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alife, Italy

Titular Bishop of Tiberiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1837Born
18 Aug 186123.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 188244.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Benevento, Italy
25 Sep 188244.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
1 Oct 188244.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta
15 Jan 188648.0AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
24 Mar 189860.2ResignedBishop of Alife, Italy
24 Mar 189860.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
10 Jun 191981.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Alife, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Scotti
Bishop Antonio Scotti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alife

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopBenevento, Archdiocese of Benevento

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,920
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 90, and Page 502
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 553
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,882, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast