Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sabas Sarasola Esparza, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Urubamba y Madre de Dios

Titular Bishop of Taenarum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1881BornArizaleta, Spain
30 Sep 190625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Jun 192342.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Urubamba y Madre de Dios, Peru
21 Jun 192342.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Taenarum
2 Sep 192342.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Taenarum
29 Feb 194462.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Urubamba y Madre de Dios, Peru

MicroData Summary for Sabas Sarasola Esparza:
Bishop Sabas Sarasola Esparza O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Urubamba y Madre de Dios

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013