Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan (de la Serna) Sánchez Alonso de Guevara, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lugo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1568Born
21 May 164273.5SelectedBishop of Lugo, Spain
13 Jul 164374.7ConfirmedBishop of Lugo, Spain
11 Oct 164374.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
12 Jan 164677.2DiedBishop of Lugo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan (de la Serna) Sánchez Alonso de Guevara
Bishop Juan (de la Serna) Sánchez Alonso de Guevara O.S.H. (born , died ) Bishop of Lugo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCabeza del Buey

  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 224
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 172, Number 1,072
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1643, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018