Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Rodríguez, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1557²Born
1575²18.0ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
1587²30.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
5 Nov 159942.8AppointedArchbishop of Angamalé, India
25 Jan 160144.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
18 Feb 162467.1DiedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Rodríguez
Archbishop Francisco Rodríguez S.J. (born 1557, died ) Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGerona, Spain

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 167
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 115, Number 732
  • ob/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 180

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018