Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Franz Riccilli (Riccius)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg

Titular Bishop of Verinopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1666BornHaselünne
169427.8Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
15 Jul 173973.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
15 Jul 173973.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
11 Oct 173973.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
25 May 175690.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Johann Franz Riccilli (Riccius):
Bishop Johann Franz Riccilli (Riccius) (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 438, and Page 452
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015