Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Clair Reyne

Deceased

Bishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1824Born
17 Jun 184824.4Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 187046.0SelectedBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
21 Mar 187046.2ConfirmedBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
18 Apr 187046.2Ordained BishopBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
14 Nov 187248.8DiedBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Clair Reyne (VIAF: 40569130)
Bishop Joseph-Clair Reyne (born , died ) Bishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManosque, France
Ordained BishopSt. Louis des Francais, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 24.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 293
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1870, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017