Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ramón Quesada y Gascón

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1845Born
21 May 189448.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
21 May 189448.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dometiopolis
25 Jul 189449.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dometiopolis
24 Mar 189852.6AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
13 Sep 190055.1DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Ramón Quesada y Gascón
Bishop José Ramón Quesada y Gascón (born , died ) Bishop of Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlmagro, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Toledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 249, and Page 509
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast