Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René-Marie-Charles Poirier, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1802Born
9 Jun 182724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
12 Nov 185856.0AppointedBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles
13 Feb 185956.3Ordained BishopBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles
23 Apr 187875.5DiedBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles

MicroData Summary for René-Marie-Charles Poirier (VIAF: 73950954)
Bishop René-Marie-Charles Poirier C.I.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Roseau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRedon, France
Ordained BishopPort of Spain, Archdiocese of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 485
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017