Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Joseph Plunkett

Deceased

Bishop of Meath, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1738Born
30 Sep 176425.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 177839.9AppointedBishop of Meath, Ireland
28 Feb 177940.1Ordained BishopBishop of Meath, Ireland
11 Jan 182788.0DiedBishop of Meath, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph Plunkett
Bishop Patrick Joseph Plunkett (born , died ) Bishop of Meath

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKells, Co. Meath
Ordained PriestCollège de Trente-trois
Ordained BishopParis
Buried Place (Original)Chapel, Navan

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 47.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,040
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 283
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 111, and Page 112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast